MO SB329 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 329-Nieves
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 329-Nieves
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows students to enroll in another school district or charter school for purposes of attending virtual courses or programs
Title
Allows students to enroll in another school district or charter school for purposes of attending virtual courses or programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 329-Nieves | |
2011-04-14 | Reported from S General Laws Committee to Floor | |
2011-04-05 | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee | |
2011-03-29 | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee | |
2011-03-15 | Hearing Cancelled S General Laws Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee | |
2011-02-23 | S First Read--SB 329-Nieves |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=4177409 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/pdf-bill/intro/SB329.pdf |