MO SB328 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 328-Romine, with SCS & SA 3 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 328-Romine, with SCS & SA 3 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to higher education
Title
Modifies provisions relating to higher education
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Romine [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 328-Romine, with SCS & SA 3 (pending) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-04-04 | Senate | SA 3 to SCS S offered (Nasheed)--(1496S02.07S) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | SA 2 to SCS S offered & adopted (Munzlinger)--(1496S02.04S) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Hegeman)--(1496S02.06S) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee w/SCS |
2017-02-14 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (1496S.02C) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | S First Read--SB 328-Romine |