MO SB325 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 325-Kraus
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 325-Kraus
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Abrogates the findings in IBM Corporation v. Director of Revenue 491 S.W.3d 535 (Mo. banc 2016)
Title
Abrogates the findings in IBM Corporation v. Director of Revenue 491 S.W.3d 535 (Mo. banc 2016)
Sponsors
Sen. Will Kraus [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 325-Kraus |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | S First Read--SB 325-Kraus |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=58035216 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB325.pdf |