MO SB31 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SB's 26, 11 & 31)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SB's 26, 11 & 31)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the tax on cigarettes by twenty-six cents, modifies the state individual income tax rate, and increases the state sales and use tax by one-half percent
Title
Increases the tax on cigarettes by twenty-six cents, modifies the state individual income tax rate, and increases the state sales and use tax by one-half percent
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-25 | Senate | Bill Combined (w/SCS SB's 26, 11 & 31) |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2013-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 31-Lamping |
2012-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/13info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=16944764 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/13info/pdf-bill/intro/SB31.pdf |