MO SB284 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the disciplinary authority of the Board of Pharmacy, defines the term legend drug for the purpose of certain pharmacy statutes, and grants exemption from sales tax for certain medical equipment and drugs
Title
Modifies the disciplinary authority of the Board of Pharmacy, defines the term legend drug for the purpose of certain pharmacy statutes, and grants exemption from sales tax for certain medical equipment and drugs
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] | Sen. Jay Wasson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-11 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by Senate President | |
2011-05-26 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2011-05-13 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-05-13 | CCS H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted | |
2011-05-13 | CCR H adopted | |
2011-05-12 | CCS S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted | |
2011-05-12 | CCR S offered & adopted | |
2011-05-12 | H submits CCR | |
2011-05-10 | H conferees appointed: Sater, Smith-150, Weter, Jones-63, Swinger | |
2011-05-10 | S conferees appointed: Wasson, Parson, Richard, Callahan, Curls | |
2011-05-10 | H refuses to recede and grants conference | |
2011-05-10 | S requests H recede or grant conference | |
2011-05-10 | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended | |
2011-05-09 | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted | |
2011-05-09 | HCS, as amended, H adopted | |
2011-05-09 | HA 4 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (Bernskoetter)--(1412L04.03H) | |
2011-05-09 | HA 3 to HCS H offered & defeated (Atkins)--(1412L04.01H) | |
2011-05-09 | HA 2 to HCS H offered & defeated (Leara)--(1412L04.01F) | |
2011-05-09 | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schad)--(1412L04.04H) | |
2011-05-04 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2011-05-04 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2011-05-03 | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2011-05-03 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-05-03 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-04-14 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2011-04-14 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Health Care Policy Committee | |
2011-04-13 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Health Care Policy Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Hearing Conducted H Health Care Policy Committee | |
2011-03-31 | Referred H Health Care Policy Committee | |
2011-03-14 | H Second Read | |
2011-03-10 | H First Read | |
2011-03-10 | S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted | |
2011-03-08 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2011-03-07 | Perfected, as amended | |
2011-03-07 | SA 1 S offered & adopted (Ridgeway)--(1412S02.02S) | |
2011-03-03 | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor | |
2011-02-28 | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2011-02-21 | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2011-02-16 | S First Read--SB 284-Wasson |