MO SB282 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to public safety
Title
Modifies provisions relating to public safety
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-05-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Crime Prevention and Public Safety |
2017-05-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Crime Prevention and Public Safety |
2017-04-25 | House | Hearing Conducted H Crime Prevention and Public Safety |
2017-04-11 | House | Referred H Crime Prevention and Public Safety |
2017-03-24 | House | H Second Read |
2017-03-16 | House | H First Read |
2017-03-16 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee - Consent |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-01-11 | Senate | S First Read--SB 282-Hegeman |