MO SB278 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 278-Munzlinger, et al
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 278-Munzlinger, et al
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the laws regarding certain private nuisance actions
Title
Modifies the laws regarding certain private nuisance actions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 278-Munzlinger, et al | |
2011-04-06 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-04-06 | Taken up for Perfection | |
2011-03-16 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-03-03 | Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee to Floor | |
2011-03-02 | Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee | |
2011-02-23 | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee | |
2011-02-15 | S First Read--SB 278-Munzlinger, et al |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=4147456 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/pdf-bill/intro/SB278.pdf |