MO SB275 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - S Bills with H Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - S Bills with H Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides a sales tax exemption for the production of electricity
Title
Provides a sales tax exemption for the production of electricity
Sponsors
Sen. Curtis Trent [R] | Rep. Alex Riley [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-10 - House - House: SBs FOR THIRD READING - HCS SB 275, A.A. SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - House: SBs FOR THIRD READING - HCS SB 275, A.A. SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 150 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - House: SBs FOR THIRD READING - HCS SB 275, A.A. SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 152 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - House: SBs FOR THIRD READING - HCS SB 275, A.A. SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 149 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - House: SB 275 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - House: SB 275 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - House: SBs FOR THIRD READING - HCS SB 275, A.A. SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 150 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - House: SBs FOR THIRD READING - HCS SB 275, A.A. SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 152 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - House: SBs FOR THIRD READING - HCS SB 275, A.A. SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 149 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - House: SB 275 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - House: SB 275 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | House | S Bills with H Amendments |
2023-05-10 | House | Motion to concur in HCS, as amended, S offered (Trent) |
2023-05-10 | House | Motion to concur in HCS, as amended, S withdrawn (Trent) |
2023-05-10 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2023-05-10 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2023-05-10 | House | HA 1 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(1161H05.21H) |
2023-05-10 | House | HA 1 to HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Haffner)--(1161H05.23H) |
2023-05-10 | House | Motion to reconsider the adoption vote on HA 1 to HCS H adopted |
2023-05-10 | House | Motion to reconsider the adoption vote on HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2023-05-10 | House | Motion to reconsider H Third Reading Vote H adopted |
2023-05-09 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2023-05-09 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2023-05-09 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (O'Donnell) |
2023-05-05 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2023-05-05 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2023-05-04 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2023-05-04 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2023-05-04 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2023-05-01 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2023-05-01 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Ways and Means |
2023-04-27 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Ways and Means |
2023-04-24 | House | Hearing Conducted H Ways and Means |
2023-04-18 | House | Referred H Ways and Means |
2023-04-18 | House | H Second Read |
2023-04-17 | House | H First Read |
2023-04-17 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Perfected, as amended |
2023-04-12 | Senate | SA 2 S offered & adopted (Cierpiot)--(1161S01.05S) |
2023-04-12 | Senate | SA 1 S offered & adopted (Roberts)--(1161S01.02S) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2023-01-04 | Senate | S First Read |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |