MO SB271 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee (1516S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Transfers the authority of the State Board of Education and the Department of Elementary and Secondary Education to regulate charter schools to the Missouri Charter Public School Commission

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transfers the authority of the State Board of Education and the Department of Elementary and Secondary Education to regulate charter schools to the Missouri Charter Public School Commission

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee (1516S.03C)
2019-03-05SenateHearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee
2019-02-07SenateSecond Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee
2019-01-17SenateS First Read--SB 271-Emery

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback