MO SB268 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-05 - Motion to vote bill do pass failed S General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-05 - Motion to vote bill do pass failed S General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the process by which public notice is required to be published
Title
Changes the process by which public notice is required to be published
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Senate | Motion to vote bill do pass failed S General Laws Committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2019-01-17 | Senate | S First Read--SB 268-Wieland |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=1596639 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB268.pdf |