MO SB268 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-26 - Referred H Higher Education Committee
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-26 - Referred H Higher Education Committee
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the statutory award amount for Alzheimer's disease research projects funded by the University of Missouri Board of Curators
Title
Increases the statutory award amount for Alzheimer's disease research projects funded by the University of Missouri Board of Curators
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Referred H Higher Education Committee | |
2011-04-12 | H Second Read | |
2011-04-11 | H First Read | |
2011-04-11 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-04-07 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Perfected | |
2011-03-31 | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor | |
2011-03-16 | Voted Do Pass S Education Committee | |
2011-03-09 | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee | |
2011-02-14 | S First Read--SB 268-Stouffer |