MO SB262 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-29 - Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-29 - Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires health benefit plans to establish equal out-of-pocket requirements for oral anticancer medications and intravenously administered chemotherapy medications
Title
Requires health benefit plans to establish equal out-of-pocket requirements for oral anticancer medications and intravenously administered chemotherapy medications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee | |
2011-03-08 | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee | |
2011-02-10 | S First Read--SB 262-Goodman |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=4132119 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/pdf-bill/intro/SB262.pdf |