MO SB261 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 261-Munzlinger
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 261-Munzlinger
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends Supreme Court Rule 52.05 to modify procedures for joinder in tort actions
Title
Amends Supreme Court Rule 52.05 to modify procedures for joinder in tort actions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 261-Munzlinger |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from S Government Reform Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee |
2017-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 261-Munzlinger |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=57611595 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB261.pdf |