MO SB26 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Creates provisions relating to public safety

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates provisions relating to public safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24SenateFormal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
2021-02-23SenateReferred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
2021-02-23SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2021-02-22SenatePerfected
2021-02-22SenateSS#2, as amended, S adopted
2021-02-22SenateSA 1 to SS#2 S offered & adopted (Roberts)--(0828S04.02S)
2021-02-22SenateSS#2 S offered (Eigel)--(0828S.04F)
2021-02-22SenateSS S withdrawn
2021-02-22SenateSA 4 to SS S offered & adopted (Luetkemeyer)--(0828S03.11S)
2021-02-22SenateSA 3 to SS S offered & adopted (Washington)--(0828S03.09S)
2021-02-22SenateSA 2 to SS S offered & adopted (May)--(0828S03.13S)
2021-02-22SenateSA 1 to SS S withdrawn
2021-02-22SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2021-02-22SenateSA 1 to SS S offered (May)--(0828S03.05S)
2021-02-22SenateSS S offered (Eigel)--(0828S.03F)
2021-02-04SenateReported from S General Laws Committee
2021-02-02SenateVoted Do Pass S General Laws Committee
2021-01-26SenateHearing Conducted S General Laws Committee
2021-01-14SenateSecond Read and Referred S General Laws Committee
2021-01-06SenateS First Read
2020-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=54105537
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/pdf-bill/intro/SB26.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/pdf-bill/perf/SB26.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3235
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3238
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3246
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3247
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3249
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3251
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3252
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/Summary.aspx?SessionType=R&SummaryID=134046834&BillID=54105537
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/FiscalNotes/2021-1/0828S.01I.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/Summary.aspx?SessionType=R&SummaryID=137888316&BillID=54105537
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/Summary.aspx?SessionType=R&SummaryID=137973188&BillID=54105537
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/FiscalNotes/2021-1/0828S.04P.ORG.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback