MO SB259 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 259-Romine, with SS & SA 3 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Implements a process for due process proceedings for Title IX complaints at institutions of higher education

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Implements a process for due process proceedings for Title IX complaints at institutions of higher education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17SenateInformal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 259-Romine, with SS & SA 3 (pending)
2019-04-16SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-04-16SenateSA 3 to SS S offered (Nasheed)--(1129S07.15S)
2019-04-16SenateSA 2 to SS S offered & defeated (Nasheed)--(1129S07.03S)
2019-04-16SenateSA 1 to SS S defeated
2019-04-16SenateSSA1 for SA 1 to SS S offered & withdrawn (Emery)--(1129S07.14F)
2019-04-16SenateSA 1 to SS offered (Nasheed)--(1129S07.02S)
2019-04-16SenateSS S offered (Romine)--(1129S.07F)
2019-04-04SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-03-07SenateReported from S Education Committee
2019-02-26SenateVoted Do Pass S Education Committee
2019-02-19SenateHearing Conducted S Education Committee
2019-02-07SenateSecond Read and Referred S Education Committee
2019-01-16SenateS First Read--SB 259-Romine

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback