MO SB259 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 259-Schaaf, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 259-Schaaf, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions related to infectious diseases reported to the Department Of Health and Senior Services
Title
Modifies provisions related to infectious diseases reported to the Department Of Health and Senior Services
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Schaaf [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 259-Schaaf, with SCS |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Reported from S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2013-04-11 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee - (1418S.02C) |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 259-Schaaf |