MO SB254 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - In Conference--SS for SCS for SB 254-Stouffer, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - In Conference--SS for SCS for SB 254-Stouffer, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies Missouri's law relating to intoxicated-related traffic offenses
Title
Modifies Missouri's law relating to intoxicated-related traffic offenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | In Conference--SS for SCS for SB 254-Stouffer, with HCS, as amended | |
2011-05-12 | H submits CCR | |
2011-05-12 | H conferees appointed: Cox, Elmer, Barnes, Colona, Carlson | |
2011-05-12 | S conferees appointed: Stouffer, Kehoe, Engler, McKenna, Wright-Jones | |
2011-05-12 | H refuses to recede and grants conference | |
2011-05-12 | S requests H recede or grant conference | |
2011-05-12 | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended | |
2011-05-11 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2011-05-11 | HCS, as amended H adopted | |
2011-05-11 | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cox)--(1491L07.02H) | |
2011-05-11 | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cox)--(1491L07.07H) | |
2011-05-05 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-05-05 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-05-04 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2011-05-04 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee | |
2011-05-04 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee | |
2011-05-02 | Hearing Conducted H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee | |
2011-04-26 | Referred H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee | |
2011-04-18 | H Second Read | |
2011-04-14 | H First Read | |
2011-04-14 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-04-14 | Reported from S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor | |
2011-04-14 | Voted Do Pass S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2011-04-14 | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2011-04-07 | Referred S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2011-04-07 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Perfected | |
2011-04-06 | SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted | |
2011-04-06 | SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Callahan)--(1491S05.02S) | |
2011-04-06 | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Stouffer)--(1491S05.01S) | |
2011-04-06 | SS for SCS S offered (Stouffer)--(1491S.05F) | |
2011-03-07 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-03-03 | Reported from S Transportation Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2011-03-02 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation Committee - (1491S.02C) | |
2011-02-23 | Hearing Conducted S Transportation Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Second Read and Referred S Transportation Committee | |
2011-02-10 | S First Read--SB 254-Stouffer |