MO SB251 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Updates provisions relating to public assistance fraud and abuse
Title
Updates provisions relating to public assistance fraud and abuse
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2013-05-22 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2013-05-16 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2013-05-16 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2013-05-16 | House | HCS H defeated |
2013-05-15 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2013-05-15 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2013-05-14 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2013-05-14 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-05-14 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-05-09 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2013-05-09 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Government Oversight and Accountability Committee |
2013-05-08 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Government Oversight and Accountability Committee |
2013-04-29 | House | Hearing Conducted H Government Oversight and Accountability Committee |
2013-04-22 | House | Referred H Government Oversight and Accountability Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | H Second Read |
2013-04-17 | House | H First Read |
2013-04-16 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Perfected |
2013-04-10 | Senate | SS S offered & adopted (Kraus)--(0105S.04F) |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2013-01-31 | Senate | S First Read--SB 251-Kraus and Chappelle-Nadal |