MO SB239 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 239-Rowden, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 239-Rowden, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies certain provisions relating to licensure for the distribution and sale of alcohol
Title
Modifies certain provisions relating to licensure for the distribution and sale of alcohol
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 239-Rowden, with SCS |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee w/SCS |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Removed S Consent Calendar |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee w/SCS - Consent |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee - Consent vote adopted (1049S.04C) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (1049S.04C) |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 239-Rowden |
2016-12-28 | Senate | Prefiled |