MO SB238 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Passed on July 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Passed on July 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a presumption that certain infectious diseases are duty-related for the purposes of firefighters' disability and death benefits
Title
Creates a presumption that certain infectious diseases are duty-related for the purposes of firefighters' disability and death benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-07 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by Senate President | |
2011-05-26 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2011-05-13 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-05-13 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2011-05-13 | H recedes in HA 1 & HA 2 and Truly Agree to and Finally pass the bill | |
2011-05-11 | S requests H recede & take up and pass bill | |
2011-05-11 | S refuses to concur in HA 1 & HA 2 | |
2011-05-11 | H Third Read and Passed, as amended | |
2011-05-11 | HA 2 H offered & adopted (Leara)--(1042S04.01H) | |
2011-05-11 | HA 1 H adopted | |
2011-05-11 | HA 1 to HA 1 H offered & withdrawn (Kelly-24)--(1042S04.01F) | |
2011-05-11 | HA 1 H offered (Stream)--(1042S04.02H) | |
2011-05-04 | Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-05-04 | Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-04-28 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2011-04-28 | Reported Do Pass H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee | |
2011-04-28 | Voted Do Pass H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee | |
2011-04-28 | Hearing Conducted H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee | |
2011-04-26 | Referred H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee | |
2011-04-18 | H Second Read | |
2011-04-14 | H First Read | |
2011-04-14 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-04-12 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2011-04-12 | Perfected | |
2011-04-12 | SS S offered & adopted (Schmitt)--(1042S.04F) | |
2011-04-11 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-04-07 | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor | |
2011-03-09 | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2011-02-21 | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2011-02-10 | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2011-02-09 | S First Read--SB 238-Schmitt, et al |