MO SB233 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the salary of county coroners in second class counties
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the salary of county coroners in second class counties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |