MO SB229 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to the Mental Health Employment Disqualification Registry

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to the Mental Health Employment Disqualification Registry

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-25SenateSigned by Governor
2013-05-22SenateDelivered to Governor
2013-05-22SenateSigned by House Speaker
2013-05-22SenateSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2013-05-22SenateReported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
2013-05-14SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2013-05-14HouseS Third Read and Passed
2013-05-14HouseS concurs in HCS
2013-05-13HouseH Third Read and Passed
2013-05-13HouseHCS H adopted
2013-05-07HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
2013-05-07HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
2013-05-01HouseReferred to H Rules Committee
2013-05-01HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
2013-05-01HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
2013-04-30HouseReturned to Committee of Origin
2013-04-30HouseVoted to Return to Committee of Origin
2013-04-17HouseReferred to H Rules Committee
2013-04-17HouseReported Do Pass H Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
2013-04-16HouseVoted Do Pass H Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
2013-04-16HouseHearing Conducted H Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
2013-04-10HouseReferred H Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
2013-04-08HouseH Second Read
2013-04-04HouseH First Read
2013-04-04SenateS Third Read and Passed
2013-04-03SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
2013-04-03SenatePerfected
2013-04-03SenateSCS, as amended, S adopted
2013-04-03SenateSA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Brown)--(1110S02.02S)
2013-03-14SenateReported from S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee to Floor w/SCS
2013-03-05SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee - (1110S.02C)
2013-02-28SenateHearing Conducted S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee
2013-02-21SenateHearing Cancelled S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee
2013-02-14SenateSecond Read and Referred S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee
2013-01-29SenateS First Read--SB 229-Brown

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback