MO SB227 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the culpable mental state necessary for a homicide offense
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the culpable mental state necessary for a homicide offense
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-12 - House - House: SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL - SS SB 227 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 106 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - House - House: SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL - SS SB 227 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - House - House: SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL - SS SB 227 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-06 | House | Signed by Governor |
2023-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2023-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2023-05-30 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2023-05-30 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2023-05-12 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2023-05-12 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2023-05-11 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Regulatory Oversight |
2023-04-26 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Regulatory Oversight |
2023-04-24 | House | Referred H Rules - Regulatory Oversight |
2023-04-20 | House | Reported Do Pass H Judiciary |
2023-04-19 | House | Voted Do Pass H Judiciary |
2023-04-12 | House | Hearing Conducted H Judiciary |
2023-04-03 | House | Referred H Judiciary |
2023-04-03 | House | H Second Read |
2023-03-30 | House | H First Read |
2023-03-30 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Perfected |
2023-03-28 | Senate | SS S offered & adopted (Coleman)--(0953S.02F) |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2023-01-04 | Senate | S First Read |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |