MO SB227 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 227-Emery, with SS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 227-Emery, with SS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the collateral source rule and provides that parties may introduce evidence of the cost, rather than the value, of the medical treatment rendered
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the collateral source rule and provides that parties may introduce evidence of the cost, rather than the value, of the medical treatment rendered
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Emery [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 227-Emery, with SS (pending) |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-03-04 | Senate | SS S offered (Emery)--(1240S.03F) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2015-01-12 | Senate | S First Read--SB 227-Emery |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=1090983 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/pdf-bill/intro/SB227.pdf |