MO SB226 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Ways and Means Committee - Consent vote adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies the filing periods for the remittance of sales taxes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies the filing periods for the remittance of sales taxes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25SenateMotion to pass bill as consent taken by S Ways and Means Committee - Consent vote adopted
2021-02-25SenateVoted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee
2021-02-11SenateHearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
2021-01-28SenateSecond Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee
2021-01-06SenateS First Read
2020-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback