MO SB224 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-11 - No motion made to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-11 - No motion made to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to crimes and law enforcement officers and agencies
Title
Modifies provisions relating to crimes and law enforcement officers and agencies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-11 | Senate | No motion made to override Governor's veto |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | CCR H adopted |
2013-05-17 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed (0860S.07S) |
2013-05-17 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (0860S07.1SR) |
2013-05-16 | House | H submits CCR |
2013-05-16 | House | S conferees appointed: Curls, Silvey, Wallingford, Pearce, Holsman |
2013-05-15 | House | H conferees appointed: Torpey, McCaherty, Rizzo |
2013-05-15 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2013-05-15 | House | S requests H recede or grant conference |
2013-05-15 | House | S refuses to concur in HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, HSA 1 for HA 5, HA 6, HA 7 & HA 8 |
2013-05-15 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2013-05-15 | House | HA 8 H offered & adopted (Scharnhorst)--(0860S03.14H) |
2013-05-15 | House | HA 7 H offered & adopted (Cross)--(0860S03.29H) |
2013-05-15 | House | HA 6 H offered & adopted (Shull)--(0860S03.28H) |
2013-05-15 | House | HSA 1 for HA 5 H offered & adopted (Rehder)--(0860S03.32H) |
2013-05-15 | House | HA 5 H offered (Brattin)--(0860S03.26H) |
2013-05-15 | House | HA 4 H offered & adopted (McCaherty)--(0860S03.16H) |
2013-05-15 | House | HA 3 H offered & adopted (Neth)--(0860S03.12H) |
2013-05-15 | House | Placed back on calendar |
2013-05-15 | House | HA 2 H offered & adopted (May)--(0860S03.19H) |
2013-05-15 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Leara)--(0860S03.11H) |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-04-25 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-04-23 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported Do Pass H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee |
2013-04-23 | House | Voted Do Pass H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Returned to Committee of Origin pursuant to Rule 25 (34) (f) c. |
2013-04-18 | House | Voted to Return to Committee of Origin H Rules Committee |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2013-04-16 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee |
2013-04-16 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Hearing Conducted H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Referred H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee |
2013-03-26 | House | H Second Read |
2013-03-25 | House | H First Read |
2013-03-14 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2013-03-14 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Reported from S Progress and Development Committee to Floor w/SCS - Consent |
2013-03-07 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Progress and Development Committee - Consent (0860S.03C) |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Progress and Development Committee |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Progress and Development Committee |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Progress and Development Committee |
2013-01-28 | Senate | S First Read--SB 224-Curls, et al |