MO SB220 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (1126S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (1126S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the taxation of partnerships
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the taxation of partnerships
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (1126S.02C) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 220-Hoskins |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=1060958 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB220.pdf |