MO SB219 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 219-Wasson, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 219-Wasson, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows owners of automated teller machines to charge access fees to those with bank accounts in foreign countries and gambling boats to accept credit instruments
Title
Allows owners of automated teller machines to charge access fees to those with bank accounts in foreign countries and gambling boats to accept credit instruments
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Wasson [R] | Rep. Don Wells [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 219-Wasson, with HCS, as amended | |
2011-05-04 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2011-05-04 | HCS, as amended, H adopted | |
2011-05-04 | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Gosen)--(1084L03.01H) | |
2011-05-04 | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Wells)--(1084L03.01L) | |
2011-04-20 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-04-20 | Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-04-07 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2011-04-07 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Financial Institutions Committee | |
2011-04-07 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Financial Institutions Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Hearing Conducted H Financial Institutions Committee | |
2011-03-31 | Referred H Financial Institutions Committee | |
2011-03-14 | H Second Read | |
2011-03-10 | H First Read | |
2011-03-10 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-03-08 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2011-03-07 | Perfected | |
2011-03-07 | SCS S adopted | |
2011-03-03 | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2011-02-28 | Removed S Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-24 | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor w/SCS - Consent | |
2011-02-21 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee - (1084S.02C) - Consent | |
2011-02-14 | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2011-02-10 | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2011-02-07 | S First Read--SB 219-Wasson |