MO SB212 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Hearing Cancelled S Health and Pensions Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Hearing Cancelled S Health and Pensions Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that inspections of certain x-ray systems shall not be required more frequently than every six years
Title
Provides that inspections of certain x-ray systems shall not be required more frequently than every six years
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Health and Pensions Committee |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 212-Sater |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=57347251 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB212.pdf |