MO SB210 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a number of official state designations, a memorial highway, and the Missouri Historical Theater program
Title
Creates a number of official state designations, a memorial highway, and the Missouri Historical Theater program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House: SB 210 (HA 1 HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 102 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House: SB 210 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 144 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House: SB 210 (HA 1 HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 102 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House: SB 210 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 144 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2019-05-16 | House | S Third Read and Passed |
2019-05-16 | House | S concurs in HCS, as amended |
2019-05-08 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2019-05-08 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2019-05-08 | House | HA 1 to HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2019-05-08 | House | HA 2 to HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Sain)--(0944H03.05H) |
2019-05-08 | House | HA 1 to HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schroer)--(0944H03.03H) |
2019-05-08 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered (Muntzel)--(0944H03.01H) |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-05-02 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-04-29 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Tourism |
2019-04-25 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Tourism |
2019-04-25 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Tourism |
2019-04-17 | House | Referred H Special Committee on Tourism |
2019-04-17 | House | H Second Read |
2019-04-16 | House | H First Read |
2019-04-16 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Perfected |
2019-04-11 | Senate | SS S offered & adopted (May)--(0944S.02F) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Removed S Consent Calendar |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws Committee - Consent |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S General Laws Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S General Laws Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 210-May |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled |