MO SB210 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SS for SCS for SB 210-Lamping, with HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SS for SCS for SB 210-Lamping, with HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Elementary and Secondary Education to hold public meetings in each congressional district on the Common Core State Standards
Title
Requires the Department of Elementary and Secondary Education to hold public meetings in each congressional district on the Common Core State Standards
Sponsors
Sen. John Lamping [R] | Sen. Brian Nieves [R] | Rep. Kurt Bahr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SS for SCS for SB 210-Lamping, with HCS |
2013-05-17 | House | Motion to concur in HCS withdrawn |
2013-05-17 | House | H Third Read and Passed - EC defeated |
2013-05-17 | House | HCS H adopted |
2013-05-14 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-05-14 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-05-13 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2013-05-13 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee |
2013-05-13 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee |
2013-05-13 | House | Hearing Conducted H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee |
2013-05-09 | House | Referred H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee |
2013-05-09 | House | H Second Read |
2013-05-08 | House | H First Read |
2013-05-08 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Perfected |
2013-05-06 | Senate | SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2013-05-06 | Senate | SA 5 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Pearce)--(1218S05.11S) |
2013-05-06 | Senate | SA 4 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Schmitt)--(8085S13.01S) |
2013-05-06 | Senate | SA 3 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Lamping)--(1218S05.13S) |
2013-05-06 | Senate | SA 2 to SS for SCS S withdrawn |
2013-05-06 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & withdrawn (Kraus)--(1218S05.12S) |
2013-05-06 | Senate | SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered (Lamping)--(1218S05.01S) |
2013-05-06 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Lamping)--(1218S05.02S) |
2013-05-06 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Lamping)--(1218S.05F) |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2013-03-27 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee - (1218S.03C) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2013-01-24 | Senate | S First Read--SB 210-Lamping and Nieves |