MO SB207 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 207-Sifton
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows emergency workers to request, receive and submit absentee ballots

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows emergency workers to request, receive and submit absentee ballots

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12SenateInformal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 207-Sifton
2017-03-30SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2017-03-16SenateReported from S Local Government and Elections Committee
2017-03-16SenateVoted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee
2017-03-07SenateHearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee
2017-01-12SenateSecond Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee
2017-01-04SenateS First Read--SB 207-Sifton
2016-12-15SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback