MO SB205 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - Hearing Conducted S Small Business and Industry Committee
Pending: Senate Small Business and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - Hearing Conducted S Small Business and Industry Committee
Pending: Senate Small Business and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to employee wages
Title
Modifies provisions relating to employee wages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 205-Sifton |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=57257707 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB205.pdf |