MO SB200 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (1215S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (1215S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts provisions relating to licenses granted by the Department of Revenue
Title
Enacts provisions relating to licenses granted by the Department of Revenue
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (1215S.02C) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 200-Hough |
2019-01-02 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=854473 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB200.pdf |