MO SB20 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-09 - Hearing Conducted S Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-09 - Hearing Conducted S Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the compulsory attendance age for the St. Louis City School District so that students must attend school from five years of age to eighteen years of age
Title
Modifies the compulsory attendance age for the St. Louis City School District so that students must attend school from five years of age to eighteen years of age
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-09 | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Hearing Cancelled S Education Committee | |
2011-01-12 | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee | |
2011-01-05 | S First Read--SB 20-Wright-Jones | |
2010-12-01 | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=4065308 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/pdf-bill/intro/SB20.pdf |