MO SB189 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 189, 217, 246, 252 & 79-Schmitt, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 189, 217, 246, 252 & 79-Schmitt, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of the Missouri Quality Jobs Act to allow benefits for projects located within dormant manufacturing plant zones
Title
Modifies provisions of the Missouri Quality Jobs Act to allow benefits for projects located within dormant manufacturing plant zones
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 189, 217, 246, 252 & 79-Schmitt, with SCS | |
2011-04-05 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-03-17 | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2011-03-09 | SCS Voted Do Pass (SCS/SBs 189, 217, 246, 252 & 79) S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee - (0836S.03C) | |
2011-02-16 | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2011-01-27 | S First Read--SB 189-Schmitt |