MO SB187 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds stationary utility vehicles to the list of vehicles requiring drivers of motor vehicles to proceed with caution upon approach
Title
Adds stationary utility vehicles to the list of vehicles requiring drivers of motor vehicles to proceed with caution upon approach
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 187-Hegeman |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=57107835 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB187.pdf |