MO SB184 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 184-Emery, with SS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 184-Emery, with SS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to water and sewer corporations
Title
Modifies provisions relating to water and sewer corporations
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Emery [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 184-Emery, with SS (pending) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-03-29 | Senate | SS S offered (Emery)--(0694S.03F) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 184-Emery |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=57098189 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB184.pdf |