MO SB18 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the collection of money by public entities
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the collection of money by public entities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS |
2017-05-11 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-05-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-05-10 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review |
2017-05-10 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-05-10 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-04-27 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Small Business |
2017-04-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Small Business |
2017-04-19 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Small Business |
2017-04-11 | House | Referred H Special Committee on Small Business |
2017-04-10 | House | H Second Read |
2017-04-06 | House | H First Read |
2017-04-06 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Perfected, as amended |
2017-03-29 | Senate | SA 2 S offered & adopted (Hoskins)--(0100S01.01S) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | SA 1 S offered & defeated (Silvey)--(0100S01.03S) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 18-Kraus |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |