MO SB173 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-31 - Hearing Conducted S Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires schools and school district to provide home school students the opportunity to participate in extracurricular activities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires schools and school district to provide home school students the opportunity to participate in extracurricular activities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-31SenateHearing Conducted S Education Committee
2017-01-11SenateSecond Read and Referred S Education Committee
2017-01-04SenateS First Read--SB 173-Schaaf
2016-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback