MO SB170 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-11 - Legislature voted to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-11 - Legislature voted to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows members of public governmental bodies to cast roll call votes in a meeting if the member is participating via videoconferencing
Title
Allows members of public governmental bodies to cast roll call votes in a meeting if the member is participating via videoconferencing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-11 | House | Legislature voted to override Governor's veto |
2013-09-11 | House | H adopted motion to override Governor's veto (Smith) |
2013-09-11 | House | S adopted motion to override Governor's veto (Chappelle-Nadal) |
2013-07-02 | House | Vetoed by Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2013-05-22 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2013-05-17 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2013-05-17 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-05-14 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-05-13 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2013-05-13 | House | Reported Do Pass H Downsizing State Government Committee |
2013-05-13 | House | Voted Do Pass H Downsizing State Government Committee |
2013-04-25 | House | Hearing Conducted H Downsizing State Government Committee |
2013-04-22 | House | Referred H Downsizing State Government Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | H Second Read |
2013-04-17 | House | H First Read |
2013-04-16 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Perfected |
2013-04-10 | Senate | SA 1 S offered & defeated (Schaaf)--(0823S01.01S) |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Removed S Consent Calendar |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor - Consent |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee - Consent |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2013-01-17 | Senate | S First Read--SB 170-Chappelle-Nadal |