MO SB17 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-07 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 285 & 17)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-07 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 285 & 17)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Phases out corporate income tax over 3 years
Title
Phases out corporate income tax over 3 years
Sponsors
Sen. Will Kraus [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | Senate | Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 285 & 17) |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 17-Kraus |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=57095285 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB17.pdf |