MO SB169 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-08 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 7, 5, 74 & 169)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-08 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 7, 5, 74 & 169)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires drug screening and testing for TANF applicants and recipients
Title
Requires drug screening and testing for TANF applicants and recipients
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 7, 5, 74 & 169) | |
2011-02-08 | Hearing Conducted S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Hearing Cancelled S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2011-01-27 | Second Read and Referred S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2011-01-25 | S First Read--SB 169-Crowell |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=4093401 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/pdf-bill/intro/SB169.pdf |