MO SB164 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee - (1044S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee - (1044S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Missouri Science, Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics Initiative within the Department of Higher Education
Title
Establishes the Missouri Science, Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics Initiative within the Department of Higher Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee - (1044S.02C) | |
2011-02-16 | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee | |
2011-01-27 | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee | |
2011-01-25 | S First Read--SB 164-Pearce |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=4093397 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/pdf-bill/intro/SB164.pdf |