MO SB160 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 160-Koenig, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 2 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Missouri Empowerment Scholarship Accounts Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Missouri Empowerment Scholarship Accounts Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17SenateInformal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 160-Koenig, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 2 (pending)
2019-03-13SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-03-13SenateSA 2 to SS for SCS S offered (Hoskins)--(0870S10.28S)
2019-03-13SenateSA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Arthur)--(0870S10.29S)
2019-03-13SenateSS for SCS S offered (Koenig)--(0870S.10F)
2019-02-12SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-02-07SenateReported from S Ways and Means Committee w/SCS
2019-02-05SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (0870S.05C)
2019-01-29SenateHearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
2019-01-24SenateSecond Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee
2019-01-09SenateS First Read--SB 160-Koenig
2018-12-06SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback