MO SB160 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows any winery, distiller, manufacturer, wholesaler, or brewer to provide liquor samples on certain licensed retail premises for tasting purposes
Title
Allows any winery, distiller, manufacturer, wholesaler, or brewer to provide liquor samples on certain licensed retail premises for tasting purposes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee | |
2011-03-30 | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee | |
2011-01-27 | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee | |
2011-01-24 | S First Read--SB 160-Cunningham |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=4091899 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/pdf-bill/intro/SB160.pdf |