MO SB15 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-24 - Bill Combined w/(SCS SBs 20, 15 & 19)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-24 - Bill Combined w/(SCS SBs 20, 15 & 19)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of law regarding certain benevolent tax credits
Title
Modifies provisions of law regarding certain benevolent tax credits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-24 | Senate | Bill Combined w/(SCS SBs 20, 15 & 19) |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2013-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 15-Richard |
2012-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/13info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=16944726 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/13info/pdf-bill/intro/SB15.pdf |