MO SB1470 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-09 - Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-09 - Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to civil penalties for violations of federally mandated natural gas safety standards
Title
Modifies provisions relating to civil penalties for violations of federally mandated natural gas safety standards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2024-02-27 | Senate | S First Read |