MO SB1468 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-17 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-17 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the condemnation of property
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the condemnation of property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee w/SCS |
2024-03-25 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (5921S.03C) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2024-02-27 | Senate | S First Read |