MO SB146 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Hearing Cancelled S General Laws Committee
Pending: Senate General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Hearing Cancelled S General Laws Committee
Pending: Senate General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the sunset on the collection of certain fees credited to the Secretary of State's Technology Trust Fund
Title
Extends the sunset on the collection of certain fees credited to the Secretary of State's Technology Trust Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S General Laws Committee |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 146-Burlison |
2018-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=152 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB146.pdf |